MO SB551 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to insurance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Wieland [R] | Rep. Noel Shull [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 551 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 551 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 551 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - House - House: SB 551 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 551 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 551 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - House - House: SB 551 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2020-05-15 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Wieland)--(3729S03.1SR) |
2020-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-14 | House | H distributes CCR--(3729S93.1SR) |
2020-05-13 | House | House conferees appointed: Eggleston, Porter, Muntzel, Ellebracht, Carpenter |
2020-05-13 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Wieland, Crawford, Cunningham, Arthur, Sifton |
2020-05-12 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2020-05-12 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2020-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-11 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2020-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Merideth)--(3729H02.02F) |
2020-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(3729H02.03H) |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2020-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2020-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy |
2020-04-28 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy |
2020-02-03 | House | H Second Read |
2020-01-30 | House | H First Read |
2020-01-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(3729S01.01S) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 551-Wieland |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |