MO SB550 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the assessment of certain tax-exempt properties
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the assessment of certain tax-exempt properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Economic Development Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 550-Hegeman |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26837975 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB550.pdf |