MO SB547 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to industrial hemp

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to industrial hemp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5165S.02C)
2018-01-22SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-08SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 547-Munzlinger
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback