MO SB538 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 538, 562 & 601-Libla, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies penalties relating to criminal offenses involving deadly weapons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies penalties relating to criminal offenses involving deadly weapons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 538, 562 & 601-Libla, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
2020-02-18SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-02-18SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(3891S05.01S)
2020-02-18SenateSS for SCS S offered (Libla)--(3891S.05F)
2020-02-18SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-02-03SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee /wSCS
2020-01-27SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 538, 562 & 601) Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3891S.04C)
2020-01-21SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 538-Libla
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback