MO SB531 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 531-Nasheed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the minimum wage laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the minimum wage laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16SenateS Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 531-Nasheed
2014-04-23SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2014-03-11SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-15SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 531-Nasheed
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback