MO SB530 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 530-Cunningham, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 530-Cunningham, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to illegal gambling
Title
Modifies provisions relating to illegal gambling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 530-Cunningham, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(3664S04.01S) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Cunningham)--(3664S.04F) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2020-01-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (3664S.02C) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 530-Cunningham |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |