MO SB526 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 526-Cunningham, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended, HA 4, as amended, HA 5 & HA 6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 526-Cunningham, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended, HA 4, as amended, HA 5 & HA 6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Division of Workers' Compensation to develop and maintain a workers' compensation claims database
Title
Requires the Division of Workers' Compensation to develop and maintain a workers' compensation claims database
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 526-Cunningham, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended, HA 4, as amended, HA 5 & HA 6 |
2014-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick)--(4280S02.11H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 5 H adopted |
2014-04-29 | House | HSA 1 for HA 5, as amended, H defeated |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 5 H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(4802S02.25H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HSA 1 for HA 5 H offered (McGaugh)--(4280S02.20H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 5 H offered (Dohrman)--(4280S02.08H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 4, as amended, H adopted |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 2 to HA 4 H offered & defeated (Marshall)--(4280S02.19H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick)--(4280S02.21H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 4 H offered (Haahr)--(4280S02.05H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 3, as amended, H adopted |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(4280S02.17H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 3 H offered (Austin)--(4280S02.07H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Jones-150)--(4280S02.06H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(4280S02.09H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-11 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-01-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (4280S.02C) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 526-Cunningham |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |