MO SB525 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides vouchers for farmers' markets for certain pregnant and postpartum women, infants, and children under 5 years of age

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides vouchers for farmers' markets for certain pregnant and postpartum women, infants, and children under 5 years of age

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateVoted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-03-22SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-03-04SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-02-22SenateS First Read

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback