MO SB524 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Referred to H Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Referred to H Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health and welfare
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health and welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred H Health Insurance Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-10 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4141S.02C) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 524-Cunningham |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |