MO SB519 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 519-Sater, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the current waiting period for having an abortion from 24 hours to 72 hours

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the current waiting period for having an abortion from 24 hours to 72 hours

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16SenateS Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 519-Sater, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
2014-03-05SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-05SenateTaken up for Perfection
2014-02-19SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-19SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Justus)--(4423S05.02S)
2014-02-19SenateSS S offered (Sater)--(4423S.05F)
2014-02-17SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-11SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor
2014-02-10SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-27SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 519-Sater
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback