MO SB518 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 518-Emery
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 518-Emery
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to hospital licensure
Title
Modifies provisions relating to hospital licensure
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 518-Emery |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 518-Emery |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=61386394 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB518.pdf |