MO SB517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (2469S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (2469S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to solar site management for pollinators
Title
Enacts provisions relating to solar site management for pollinators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (2469S.02C) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 517-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5255855 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB517.pdf |