MO SB510 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (2412S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the salary of county sheriffs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the salary of county sheriffs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (2412S.02C)
2021-03-23SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-03-04SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-02-11SenateS First Read

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback