MO SB508 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies various provisions relating to health insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies various provisions relating to health insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateNo motion to override Governor's veto
2014-07-07SenateVetoed by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-15SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-15HouseS Third Read and Passed
2014-05-15HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2014-05-14HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-14HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-14HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McManus)--(4357H05.30H)
2014-05-14HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Allen)--(4357H05.22H)
2014-05-05HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-30HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee
2014-04-30HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee
2014-04-30HouseHearing Conducted H Health Insurance Committee
2014-04-17HouseReferred H Health Insurance Committee
2014-02-17HouseH Second Read
2014-02-13HouseH First Read
2014-02-13SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-02-12SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2014-02-11SenatePerfected
2014-02-10SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2014-01-21SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-14SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 508-Parson
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback