MO SB50 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 46 & 50)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 46 & 50)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies sales tax collection requirements for certain sellers and reduces the top income tax rate
Title
Modifies sales tax collection requirements for certain sellers and reduces the top income tax rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 46 & 50) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 50-Eigel |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=55 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB50.pdf |