MO SB498 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (Fiscal Review 5-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to health insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to health insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HouseH Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (Fiscal Review 5-12)
2014-05-12HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-12HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-08HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-05-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee
2014-05-08HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee
2014-05-08HouseHearing Conducted H Health Insurance Committee
2014-05-06HouseHearing Cancelled H Health Insurance Committee
2014-04-17HouseReferred H Health Insurance Committee
2014-02-17HouseH Second Read
2014-02-13HouseH First Read
2014-02-13SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-02-12SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2014-02-11SenatePerfected
2014-02-11SenateSS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(4428S.03F)
2014-02-10SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2014-01-21SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-14SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 498-Schaefer
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback