MO SB497 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to special purpose districts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to special purpose districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | HCS H defeated |
2015-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government w/HCA 1 & HCA 2 |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government w/Amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2015-04-30 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-29 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 3 S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(2194L01.01F) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Dempsey)--(2194L01.02S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 1 S adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Hegeman)--(2194L01.01S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 497-Hegeman |