MO SB492 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to contracts between public entities and companies who discriminate against firearms manufacturers
Title
Creates provisions relating to contracts between public entities and companies who discriminate against firearms manufacturers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | S First Read |