MO SB492 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the authorization for funding and administrative processes in higher education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the authorization for funding and administrative processes in higher education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2014-05-15 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-15 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (4393S11.1SR) |
2014-05-15 | House | H submits CCR (4393S11.1SR) |
2014-05-14 | House | S conferees appointed: Pearce, Brown, Romine, Keaveny, Sifton |
2014-05-13 | House | H conferees appointed: Thomson, Swan, Pierson |
2014-05-13 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-05-13 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-05-13 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-12 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-12 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Berry)--(4393L09.01L) |
2014-05-12 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(4393L09.21H) |
2014-05-12 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(4393L09.17H) |
2014-05-12 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Thomson)--(4393L09.19H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Higher Education Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read (w/EC) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SA 2 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4393S07.11S) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4393S07.10S) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(4393S07.09S) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(4393S07.06S) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-01-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4393S.07C) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 492-Pearce |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |