MO SB491 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-13SenateGovernor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
2014-04-28SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-04-28SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-04-28SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-04-28SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-04-24SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-04-24HouseS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-24HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2014-04-24HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-04-24HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-04-24HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4153H07.01H)
2014-04-24HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-04-23HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-04-22HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-22HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-22HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-14HouseReferred H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-14HouseH Second Read
2014-04-10HouseH First Read
2014-04-10SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-10SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2014-04-10SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-04-09SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-04-09SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-04-07SenatePerfected
2014-04-07SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-04-07SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(4153S05.07S)
2014-04-07SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(4153S05.08S)
2014-04-07SenateSS for SCS S offered (Justus and Dixon)--(4153S.05F)
2014-03-12SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-12SenateTaken up for Perfection
2014-03-12SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-12SenateTaken up for Perfection
2014-03-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-11SenateTaken up for Perfection
2014-02-24SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-13SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-02-03SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4153S.03C)
2014-01-22SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-15SenateHearing to be Continued S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 491-Justus and Dixon
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback