MO SB489 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (2352S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (2352S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows financial institutions to provide services to certain organizations
Title
Allows financial institutions to provide services to certain organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (2352S.03C) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | S First Read |