MO SB481 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to the recovery of overpaid unemployment benefits
Title
Creates new provisions relating to the recovery of overpaid unemployment benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | S First Read |