MO SB478 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts school districts from the required number of days school districts are required to make up for days lost due to inclement weather for the 2018-2019 school year
Title
Exempts school districts from the required number of days school districts are required to make up for days lost due to inclement weather for the 2018-2019 school year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 478-Holsman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5250725 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB478.pdf |