MO SB476 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (2404S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (2404S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows any person, including a nonresident military spouse of Missouri to apply for a license in Missouri, provided such person also submits proof of current licensure in any jurisdiction and any required application fee
Title
Allows any person, including a nonresident military spouse of Missouri to apply for a license in Missouri, provided such person also submits proof of current licensure in any jurisdiction and any required application fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (2404S.03C) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 476-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5166221 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB476.pdf |