MO SB476 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] | Rep. Rocky Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources w/HCA 1, HCA 2, HCA 3, HCA 4 & HCA 5 |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources w/Amendments |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-04-27 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-23 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(2217S02.01S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SS S offered (Kehoe)--(2217S.02F) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 476-Kehoe |