MO SB468 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Formal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-09HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-10HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-04-01HouseH Second Read
2019-03-28HouseH First Read
2019-03-28SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent
2019-03-13SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted
2019-03-13SenateVoted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-03-13SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-03-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-02-27SenateS First Read--SB 468-Williams

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback