MO SB45 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Executive Session Scheduled H Rules - Administrative Oversight--(1:45 p.m. - HR 3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates new provisions relating to certain firefighters who contracted certain types of cancer as a result of employment as a firefighter

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates new provisions relating to certain firefighters who contracted certain types of cancer as a result of employment as a firefighter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseExecutive Session Scheduled H Rules - Administrative Oversight--(1:45 p.m. - HR 3)
2021-05-05HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-05-04HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-05-04HouseReported Do Pass H Emerging Issues
2021-05-04HouseVoted Do Pass H Emerging Issues
2021-05-03HouseHearing Conducted H Emerging Issues
2021-04-29HouseReferred H Emerging Issues
2021-04-29HouseH Second Read
2021-04-28HouseH First Read
2021-04-27SenateS Third Read and Passed
2021-04-27SenateReported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-04-22SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-04-21SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-04-20SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-04-20SenatePerfected
2021-04-20SenateSS S adopted
2021-04-20SenateSA 1 to SS S withdrawn
2021-04-20SenatePoint of order - SA 1 goes beyond scope of original bill (Beck)
2021-04-20SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Onder)--(0356S06.01S)
2021-04-20SenateSS S offered (Hough)--(0356S.06F)
2021-04-15SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-03-11SenateReported from S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-03-09SenateVoted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-02-23SenateHearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-02-16SenateHearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54235420
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB45.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/perf/SB45.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3660
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3663
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134042016&BillID=54235420
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0356S.03I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=143333991&BillID=54235420
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0356S.06P.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/Journals/RDay560427923-995.pdf#986

Bill Comments 750

feedback