MO SB45 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws regarding arbitration agreements between employers and at-will employees
Title
Modifies laws regarding arbitration agreements between employers and at-will employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken up |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-03-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-02-27 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-23 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-23 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SA 5 S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0366S01.21S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SA 4 S defeated |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 4 S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(0366S01.01F) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SA 4 S offered (Schupp)--(0366S01.12S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SA 3 S defeated |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SA 3 S offered (Silvey)--(0366S01.06S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(0366S01.07S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Romine)--(0366S01.05S) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 45-Romine |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |