MO SB445 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1095S.06C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1095S.06C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts and charter schools to receive state school funding under the foundation formula for high school students who are taking competency-based credits
Title
Allows school districts and charter schools to receive state school funding under the foundation formula for high school students who are taking competency-based credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1095S.06C) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 445-Arthur |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5022127 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB445.pdf |