MO SB445 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 445-Rowden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 445-Rowden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to fantasy sports
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to fantasy sports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 445-Rowden |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | S First Read--SB 445-Rowden |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=60470650 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB445.pdf |