MO SB435 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to hospital infection control data reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to hospital infection control data reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateVoted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-04-17SenateHearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-03-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-02-25SenateS First Read--SB 435-White

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback