MO SB434 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(1765S02.01S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | S First Read--SB 434-Sater |