MO SB433 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (2108S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (2108S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offense of vehicle hijacking
Title
Creates the offense of vehicle hijacking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (2108S.02C) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 433-Onder |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4941202 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB433.pdf |