MO SB43 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the law relating to unlawful discrimination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the law relating to unlawful discrimination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 4) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 4) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 81 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 6) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House: SB 43 (*HA 6) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HouseSigned by Governor
2017-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker
2017-05-22HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2017-05-22HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2017-05-08HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2017-05-08HouseH Third Read and Passed
2017-05-08HouseHA 6 H offered & defeated (Dogan)--(0524S07.21H)
2017-05-08HouseHA 5 H offered & defeated (Evans)--(0524S07.38H)
2017-05-08HouseHA 4 H offered & defeated (Barnes-60)--(0524S07.74H)
2017-05-08HouseHA 3 H offered & defeated (White)--(0524S07.62H)
2017-05-08HouseHA 2 H offered & defeated (Dogan)--(0524S07.18H)
2017-05-08HouseHA 1 H offered & withdrawn (Engler)--(0524S07.35H)
2017-04-20HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2017-04-20HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2017-04-18HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2017-04-18HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-04-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-04-10HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-04-10HouseReported Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
2017-04-10HouseVoted Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
2017-04-03HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
2017-03-16HouseReferred H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
2017-03-06HouseH Second Read
2017-03-02HouseH First Read
2017-03-02SenateS Third Read and Passed
2017-03-02SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-03-02SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-03-02SenateHearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-03-01SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-03-01SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-02-28SenatePerfected
2017-02-28SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(0524S.07F)
2017-02-28SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2017-02-28SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S defeated
2017-02-27SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-27SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(0524S06.12S)
2017-02-27SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(0524S06.06S)
2017-02-27SenateSS for SCS S offered (Romine)--(0524S.06F)
2017-02-02SenateReported from S Small Business and Industry Committee, with SCS
2017-01-31SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0524S.02C)
2017-01-24SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 43-Romine
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095378
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB43.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/comm/SB43.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/perf/SB43.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/tat/SB43.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/Journals/RDay330302392-410.pdf#404
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/069.002.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback