MO SB42 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 51 & 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 51 & 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to civil actions arising during a declared state of emergency due to COVID-19
Title
Modifies provisions relating to civil actions arising during a declared state of emergency due to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 51 & 42) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |