MO SB413 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 413-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 413-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that after July 1, 2018, the amount paid to counties for the local incarceration of prisoners shall not be less than one half of the amount paid to the Department of Corrections
Title
Provides that after July 1, 2018, the amount paid to counties for the local incarceration of prisoners shall not be less than one half of the amount paid to the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 413-Munzlinger |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 413-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=59794796 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB413.pdf |