MO SB411 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies examination requirements for physicians and surgeons
Title
Modifies examination requirements for physicians and surgeons
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 411-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2669500 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB411.pdf |