MO SB408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1790S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1790S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the licensing and commissioning of corporate security advisors by the Department of Public Safety
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the licensing and commissioning of corporate security advisors by the Department of Public Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1790S.04C) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 408-Libla |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2669497 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB408.pdf |