MO SB400 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the accreditation of public schools, school districts, and charter schools
Title
Modifies provisions related to the accreditation of public schools, school districts, and charter schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2021-03-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1480S.05C) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | S First Read |