MO SB400 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 400-Onder, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 400-Onder, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the state shall not require maintenance of licensure or any form of specialty medical board certification to practice medicine
Title
Provides that the state shall not require maintenance of licensure or any form of specialty medical board certification to practice medicine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 400-Onder, with SS (pending) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | SS S offered (Onder)--(1577S.03F) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 400-Onder |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2585267 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB400.pdf |