MO SB40 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to natural resources

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to natural resources

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2021-05-13HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2021-05-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2021-05-12HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-05-11HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2021-05-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-05-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues
2021-05-05HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues
2021-05-03HouseExecutive Session Scheduled - Action postponed
2021-04-20HouseHearing Conducted H Emerging Issues
2021-04-14HouseReferred H Emerging Issues
2021-04-12HouseH Second Read
2021-04-08HouseH First Read
2021-04-08SenateS Third Read and Passed
2021-04-08SenateReported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-04-08SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-04-06SenateExecutive session held, motion failed for lack of second S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-03-24SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-03-24SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-03-24SenatePerfected
2021-03-24SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2021-03-24SenateSA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0155S05.01S)
2021-03-24SenateSA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0155S05.03S)
2021-03-24SenateSA 1 to SCS, as amended, S adopted
2021-03-24SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0155S05.06S)
2021-03-24SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered (Eigel)--(0155S05.04S)
2021-02-25SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
2021-02-22SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (0155S.05C)
2021-01-25SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54107223
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB40.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/SCSfromResearch/SB40.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/comm/SB40.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/perf/SB40.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0040.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3444
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3446
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3447
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3448
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134042011&BillID=54107223
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0155S.02I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=137866772&BillID=54107223
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0155S.05C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=140736688&BillID=54107223
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0155S.05P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0155S.05P.UPD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0155H.12C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=145049597&BillID=54107223
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0155H.12C.UPD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=149597710&BillID=54107223
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/Journals/RDay460408696-713.pdf#699

Bill Comments 750

feedback