MO SB397 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Executive Session Scheduled H Local Government--(6:00 p.m. or upon adjournment whichever is later - HR 5)
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 7:00 pm in House Hearing Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the period of time in which a petition to create a museum and cultural district may be filed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the period of time in which a petition to create a museum and cultural district may be filed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session Scheduled H Local Government--(6:00 p.m. or upon adjournment whichever is later - HR 5)
2019-04-16HouseHearing Conducted H Local Government
2019-04-10HouseReferred H Local Government
2019-04-01HouseH Second Read
2019-03-28HouseH First Read
2019-03-28SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent
2019-03-13SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted
2019-03-13SenateVoted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-03-13SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-02-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-02-18SenateS First Read--SB 397-White

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback