MO SB397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the period of time in which a petition to create a museum and cultural district may be filed
Title
Extends the period of time in which a petition to create a museum and cultural district may be filed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 397 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2019-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2019-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2019-04-01 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-28 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 397-White |