MO SB395 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the practice of public accounting
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the practice of public accounting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 395 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 H offered & withdrawn (Barnes)--(1632S01.04H) |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken up |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2017-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 395-Hoskins |