MO SB393 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the corporate income tax
Title
Eliminates the corporate income tax
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | S First Read |