MO SB393 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the MO HealthNet benefits of offenders in correctional facilities and jails to be suspended rather than terminated

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the MO HealthNet benefits of offenders in correctional facilities and jails to be suspended rather than terminated

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-03-13SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-02-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-02-18SenateS First Read--SB 393-Hough

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback