MO SB391 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0038S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0038S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Abolition of Abortion in Missouri Act"
Title
Establishes the "Abolition of Abortion in Missouri Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0038S.05C) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | S First Read |