MO SB391 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 391-Lager
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 391-Lager
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the school board of each school district and charter school to establish an evaluation system for teachers and teaching
Title
Requires the school board of each school district and charter school to establish an evaluation system for teachers and teaching
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 391-Lager | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-06 | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-03-01 | S First Read--SB 391-Lager |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4203944 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB391.pdf |