MO SB39 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 39-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 39-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the concealed carry of firearms on public transportation systems and the transporting of nonfunctioning or unloaded firearms on public buses
Title
Allows the concealed carry of firearms on public transportation systems and the transporting of nonfunctioning or unloaded firearms on public buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 39-Onder |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 39-Onder |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=25 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB39.pdf |