MO SB385 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies various provisions governing financial transactions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies various provisions governing financial transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateHearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-02-16SenateHearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-02-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
2021-01-13SenateS First Read

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback